Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Pietro Galzigna

Deceased

Bishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1740Born
30 Oct 176323.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 179050.3AppointedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
27 Dec 179050.3Ordained BishopBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
1 Jun 179554.8AppointedBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
26 Dec 182383.3DiedBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Pietro Galzigna
Bishop Giovanni Pietro Galzigna (born , died ) Bishop of Arbe (Rab)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArbe, Diocese of Arbe (Rab)
Ordained BishopPropaganda Fide, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceArbe, Diocese of Arbe (Rab)
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Arbe, Diocese of Arbe (Rab)

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 95, and Page 411
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,791, Number 20
  • ob/c2+: AT, 21 Apr 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,724

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast