Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gregorio Lazzari, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1713BornDubrovnik
25 Jul 173623.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Dec 177764.8AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
21 Dec 177764.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
8 Jan 179278.9DiedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Lazzari:
Archbishop Gregorio Lazzari O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013