Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Dominik Juras

Deceased

Bishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1742Born
14 Aug 176623.6Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 177835.5AppointedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
9 Aug 177835.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
19 Sep 180259.7DiedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Ivan Dominik Juras
Bishop Ivan Dominik Juras (born , died ) Bishop of Pula (Pola)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArbe

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 342
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast