Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Molin, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bergamo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1709Born
19 Sep 173324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
13 Sep 177364.1AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
19 Sep 177364.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bergamo, Italy
2 Mar 177767.5DiedBishop of Bergamo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Molin
Bishop Marco Molin O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Bergamo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 121
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast