Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonifacio da Ponte, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1726BornVenezia
1 Mar 174922.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Jul 177650.2AppointedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
21 Jul 177650.2Ordained BishopBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
6 Jan 181083.7DiedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Bonifacio da Ponte:
Bishop Bonifacio da Ponte O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper)

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 247
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015