Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diodato Maria Difnico, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1717Born
27 May 174527.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
30 May 174527.8Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
28 Sep 177861.2AppointedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
4 Oct 177861.2Ordained BishopBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
Aug 1788³71.0DiedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diodato Maria Difnico
Bishop Diodato Maria Difnico C.R.L. (born , died Aug 1788) Bishop of Krk (Veglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSibenik

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 434
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018