Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcantonio Conti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pesaro, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Damascus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1733Born
12 Jun 175622.7Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 177440.4AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
8 May 177440.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pesaro, Italy
2 Mar 177541.4ResignedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
3 Apr 177541.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
25 Jan 178046.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Pesaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marcantonio Conti
Archbishop Marcantonio Conti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pesaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma

  • a priest for 23.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 191, and Page 339
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017