Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tommaso Maria Francone, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Manfredonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1732BornRipa
1748¹15.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
20 Dec 175523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
17 Jul 177542.5AppointedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
25 Jul 177542.5Ordained BishopBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
23 Jun 177744.5AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
25 May 179966.4DiedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Maria Francone:
Archbishop Tommaso Maria Francone C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Manfredonia

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 381, and Page 425
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015