Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Innocenzo Cardinal Conti

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1731BornRoma, Italy
26 Nov 176938.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
18 Dec 176938.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
26 Dec 176938.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
23 Sep 177140.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
19 Apr 177342.1Elevated to Cardinal
26 May 177443.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
3 Apr 177544.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
15 Dec 178352.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
15 Nov 178554.7DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli

MicroData Summary for Innocenzo Conti (VIAF: 67405204)
Innocenzo Cardinal Conti (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli

  • a bishop for 15.8 years
  • a cardinal for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Sep 1771
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 424
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 239

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Nov 2016