Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Firrao

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1736BornFagnano, Italy
25 Feb 178245.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
10 Mar 178245.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Mar 178245.6Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 178245.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
8 Apr 178245.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
1795²58.4AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
23 Feb 180164.5Elevated to Cardinal
20 Jul 180165.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
24 Jan 183093.5DiedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Firrao:
Giuseppe Cardinal Firrao (born , died ) Secretary of Bishops and Regulars

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 47.8 years
  • a cardinal for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Feb 1801
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1782, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 31 Dec 2015