Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Andrea Serrao

Deceased

Bishop of Potenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1731Born
15 Mar 175524.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 178251.3SelectedBishop of Potenza, Italy
18 Jul 178352.4ConfirmedBishop of Potenza, Italy
20 Jul 178352.4Ordained BishopBishop of Potenza, Italy
24 Feb 179968.0DiedBishop of Potenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Andrea Serrao
Bishop Giovanni Andrea Serrao (born , died ) Bishop of Potenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelmonardo

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 347
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018