Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Manni

Deceased

Bishop of Tivoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1740³BornFabriano
25 Mar 178141.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Feb 178545.0AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
20 Feb 178545.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tivoli, Italy
15 Apr 181575.2DiedBishop of Tivoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Manni:
Bishop Vincenzo Manni (born , died ) Bishop of Tivoli

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 407

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 15 Jan 2016