Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emilio Gentile

Deceased

Bishop of Alife


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1733BornBiccari
17 Apr 175623.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 177643.3AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
21 Jul 177643.3Ordained BishopBishop of Alife, Italy
24 Feb 182288.9DiedBishop of Alife, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emilio Gentile:
Bishop Emilio Gentile (born , died ) Bishop of Alife

  • a priest for 65.8 years
  • a bishop for 45.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 77
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015