Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giambattista Ettore Caracciolo, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1726BornNapoli
1 May 174923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
1 Jun 177852.1AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
7 Jun 177852.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
22 May 178054.1DiedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Ettore Caracciolo:
Archbishop Giambattista Ettore Caracciolo C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 116

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013