Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Molinari, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bovino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1707³BornLagonegro
25 Feb 173022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1 Jun 177871.2AppointedBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
7 Jun 177871.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
24 Aug 177871.4InstalledBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
15 Dec 178376.7AppointedBishop of Bovino, Italy
18 Jan 179284.8DiedBishop of Bovino, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Molinari:
Bishop Nicola Molinari O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Bovino

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 129, and Page 353
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015