Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Capecelatro

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Taranto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1744BornNapoli
19 Dec 176723.2Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 177833.4SelectedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
30 Mar 177833.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
12 Apr 177833.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
28 Mar 181772.5ResignedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
2 Nov 183692.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Taranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Capecelatro:
Archbishop Giuseppe Capecelatro (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Taranto

  • a priest for 68.8 years
  • a bishop for 58.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 393
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015