Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cirillo Antonini

Deceased

Bishop of Anagni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1742BornMontis Bodii
3 Jan 177330.7Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 177836.5AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
11 Oct 177836.5Ordained BishopBishop of Anagni, Italy
20 Jan 1789³46.8DiedBishop of Anagni, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cirillo Antonini:
Bishop Cirillo Antonini (born , died ) Bishop of Anagni

  • a priest for 16.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015