Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Bocchini, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1722Born
29 Sep 174624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
28 Sep 177856.2AppointedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
4 Oct 177856.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
16 Jan 178562.5DiedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Bocchini
Bishop Bernardo Bocchini O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Cefalonia e Zante

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiove di Sacco

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 160
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018