Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Andrea Cardinal Archetti

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Archbishop (Personal Title) of Ascoli Piceno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1731BornBrescia
10 Sep 177544.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 177544.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
17 Sep 177544.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
18 Sep 177544.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
20 Sep 178453.0Elevated to Cardinal
27 Jun 178553.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
1 Jun 179563.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
2 Apr 180068.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
5 Nov 180574.2DiedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Andrea Archetti:
Giovanni Andrea Cardinal Archetti (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a priest for 30.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
  • a cardinal for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Sep 1784
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Mar 2014