Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Prószyński

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Mennith


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1709³BornMinsk
7 Jun 177363.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Jun 177363.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 Feb 177767.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mennith
21 Sep 177767.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mennith
4 Nov 179081.0DiedTitular Bishop of Mennith

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Józef Prószyński:
Bishop Józef Prószyński (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Mennith

  • a priest for 17.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 286
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1777, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015