Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Wodzyński

Deceased

Bishop of Smoleńsk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1727BornKiernozien
14 Mar 175022.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Mar 175023.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Apr 175932.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
4 Apr 175932.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Theveste
24 Jun 175932.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theveste
29 Jan 176335.8SucceededBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
28 Nov 178861.6DiedBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Wodzyński:
Bishop Gabriel Wodzyński (born , died ) Bishop of Smoleńsk

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 382, and Page 395
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015