Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walenty Wołczacki, O.P. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Tamasus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1740¹BornVilnius, Lithuania
2 Mar 176626.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Preachers
6 Jun 177434.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamasus
21 Aug 177434.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamasus
8 Jan 180969.0DiedTitular Bishop of Tamasus

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Walenty Wołczacki:
Bishop Walenty Wołczacki O.P. (born 1740, died ) Titular Bishop of Tamasus

  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 391
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,893

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 31 Dec 2015