Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Enrico Beltramini-Miazzi

Deceased

Bishop of Feltre, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1738Born
19 Dec 177234.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 177739.1AppointedBishop of Feltre, Italy
21 Dec 177739.1Ordained BishopBishop of Feltre, Italy
24 Mar 177940.3DiedBishop of Feltre, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Enrico Beltramini-Miazzi
Bishop Girolamo Enrico Beltramini-Miazzi (born , died ) Bishop of Feltre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBassano

  • a priest for 6.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 214
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1777, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018