Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Maria (Hercules Antonio Vincent) Carenzoni, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Feltre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1748BornBrescia
14 Mar 177224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Jul 178638.3AppointedBishop of Feltre, Italy
30 Jul 178638.4Ordained BishopBishop of Feltre, Italy
20 Aug 181163.4DiedBishop of Feltre, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Maria (Hercules Antonio Vincent) Carenzoni:
Bishop Bernardo Maria (Hercules Antonio Vincent) Carenzoni O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Feltre

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 214
  • c34: CB, 25 Jan 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 17 Jan 2016