Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Zaguri

Deceased

Bishop of Vicenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1738BornVenezia
25 Sep 176325.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Sep 176325.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 177739.5AppointedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
21 Dec 177739.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ceneda, Italy
26 Sep 178547.3AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
12 Sep 181072.3DiedBishop of Vicenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Zaguri:
Bishop Marco Zaguri (born , died ) Bishop of Vicenza

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 159, and Page 441

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 15 Sep 2013