Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Baptista Santonini

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Famagusta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1716Born
16 Oct 174024.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 178366.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Samaria
29 Sep 178366.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samaria
27 Jun 178568.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Famagusta
12 Jan 179578.2DiedTitular Bishop of Famagusta

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Baptista Santonini
Bishop Giovanni Baptista Santonini (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Famagusta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 213, and Page 365
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,022
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,783, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast