Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Nani

Deceased

Bishop of Brescia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1727BornVenezia
27 Mar 176235.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 176740.2SelectedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
10 Jul 176740.3ConfirmedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
26 Jul 176740.4Ordained BishopBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
19 Apr 177346.1AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
23 Oct 180477.6DiedBishop of Brescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Nani:
Bishop Giovanni Nani (born , died ) Bishop of Brescia

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 131, and Page 410
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 1 Jan 2016