Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Scipione Cardinal Borghèse

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Prefecture of the Papal Household

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1734BornRoma
22 Sep 175925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
5 Jun 176531.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Teodosia
9 Jun 176531.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Teodosia
23 Jul 176632.3AppointedPrefect of the Prefecture of the Papal Household
10 Sep 177036.4Elevated to Cardinal
12 Dec 177036.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
16 Dec 177137.7ResignedPrefect of the Prefecture of the Papal Household
26 Dec 178248.7DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Prefecture of the Papal Household

MicroData Summary for Scipione Borghèse:
Scipione Cardinal Borghèse (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Prefecture of the Papal Household

  • a priest for 23.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
  • a cardinal for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Sep 1770
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015