Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Olivier-Simon Le Bon, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Siam

Titular Bishop of Metellopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1710BornSaint-Malo, France
22 Aug 176454.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand
22 Aug 176454.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
28 Dec 176656.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
30 Sep 177666.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand
27 Oct 178070.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Olivier-Simon Le Bon:
Bishop Olivier-Simon Le Bon M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Siam

  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013