Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Lotrecchi

Deceased

Bishop of Todi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1726Born
1 May 177245.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 178053.7AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
27 Mar 178053.8Ordained BishopBishop of Todi, Italy
10 Sep 180074.2DiedBishop of Todi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Lotrecchi
Bishop Giovanni Lotrecchi (born , died ) Bishop of Todi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFano

  • a priest for 28.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 421
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018