Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baldassare Barone de Moncada

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1725Born
8 Sep 174823.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 176843.0AppointedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
24 Jun 176843.0Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
11 Apr 178963.8DiedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy

MicroData Summary for Baldassare Barone de Moncada
Bishop Baldassare Barone de Moncada (born , died ) Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReggio di Calabria

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,791
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 275
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,768, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast