Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Maria Cardinal Durini

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Ancyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1725BornMilano, Italy
20 Dec 176641.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 176641.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ancyra
28 Dec 176641.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ancyra
31 Dec 176641.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
7 Sep 177247.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
20 May 177650.9Elevated to Cardinal
28 Apr 179670.9DiedTitular Archbishop of Ancyra

MicroData Summary for Angelo Maria Durini (VIAF: 61554828)
Angelo Maria Cardinal Durini (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Ancyra

  • a priest for 29.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
  • a cardinal for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 May 1776
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 82
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 42
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Nov 2016