Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Lercari

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1722BornTaggia
1 Mar 174926.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Mar 174926.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 176038.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
21 Dec 176038.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
10 Jul 176744.7AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
18 Mar 180279.4DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Lercari:
Archbishop Giovanni Lercari (born , died ) Archbishop of Genova

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 66, and Page 241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 15 Oct 2013