Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartholomaeus Amoroso

Deceased

Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1705BornNapoli
18 Dec 172823.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 176660.7SelectedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
2 Jun 176660.7ConfirmedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
8 Jun 176660.7Ordained BishopBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
Dec 1771³66.2DiedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartholomaeus Amoroso:
Bishop Bartholomaeus Amoroso (born , died Dec 1771) Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 185
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 7 Dec 2015