Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro di Gennaro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1705Born
5 Aug 176560.1AppointedBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy
11 Aug 176560.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy
17 May 177872.8ResignedBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro di Gennaro
Bishop Pietro di Gennaro (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Cava (de’ Tirreni)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 158
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018