Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Clarelli

Deceased

Bishop of Rieti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1705³Born
8 Apr 173024.3Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 176155.3AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
26 Apr 176155.4Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti, Italy
18 Jun 176458.5DiedBishop of Rieti, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Clarelli
Bishop Girolamo Clarelli (born , died ) Bishop of Rieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRieti

  • a priest for 34.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 354
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1761, Number 10
  • c2: CB, 26 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast