Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Spínola

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1713BornGenoa, Italy
22 Mar 174430.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Mar 174430.4Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 174430.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
19 Apr 174430.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
2 May 174430.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
25 Feb 175440.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
Apr 1754³40.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
24 Aug 175440.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
5 Oct 175440.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
24 Sep 175945.9Elevated to Cardinal
20 Jul 176046.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
15 Dec 176047.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
13 Mar 177561.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
3 Apr 177561.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
22 Jul 178470.7DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Spínola (VIAF: 89567881)
Girolamo Cardinal Spínola (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
  • a cardinal for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1759
  • ob/c2+: CB, 19 Jun 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 12
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016