Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano Giustiniani

Deceased

Bishop of Albenga, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1738Born
11 Apr 177941.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jul 177941.3AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
18 Jul 177941.3Ordained BishopBishop of Albenga, Italy
29 Mar 179153.0DiedBishop of Albenga, Italy

MicroData Summary for Stefano Giustiniani
Bishop Stefano Giustiniani (born , died ) Bishop of Albenga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

  • a priest for 11.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 74
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast