Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Angelo Monticelli

Deceased

Bishop of Isola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1722Born
18 Mar 174725.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 176644.5AppointedBishop of Isola, Italy
27 Jul 176644.5Ordained BishopBishop of Isola, Italy
15 May 179876.3DiedBishop of Isola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michael Angelo Monticelli
Bishop Michael Angelo Monticelli (born , died ) Bishop of Isola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRossano

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 244
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018