Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Prospero Celestino Meloni

Deceased

Bishop of Narni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1715³BornFerrarese
17 Apr 174529.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 Nov 176146.1AppointedBishop of Narni, Italy
30 Nov 176146.1Ordained BishopBishop of Narni, Italy
1971¹255.2DiedBishop of Narni, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Prospero Celestino Meloni:
Bishop Prospero Celestino Meloni (born ) Bishop of Narni

  • a priest for 225.7 years
  • a bishop for 209.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013