Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Agostino de Simone

Deceased

Bishop of Montepeloso, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1711Born
14 Jun 173423.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 176352.1AppointedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
24 Jul 176352.1Ordained BishopBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
1781¹69.6DiedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Agostino de Simone
Bishop Tommaso Agostino de Simone (born , died 1781) Bishop of Montepeloso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampi

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 295
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,763, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast