Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Angelo Maria Landini, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Porphyreon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1695BornFirenze
24 Jun 171822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
20 Feb 176468.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
25 Feb 176468.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
17 Feb 178286.6DiedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon

MicroData Summary for Nicola Angelo Maria Landini:
Bishop Nicola Angelo Maria Landini O.S.A. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Porphyreon

  • a priest for 63.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 344
  • c34: CB, 18 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014