Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Andrea Vegni

Deceased

Bishop of Montalcino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1711³BornPienza
24 Sep 173524.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 176756.3AppointedBishop of Montalcino, Italy
27 Dec 176756.3Ordained BishopBishop of Montalcino, Italy
8 Nov 177362.2DiedBishop of Montalcino, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Andrea Vegni:
Bishop Domenico Andrea Vegni (born , died ) Bishop of Montalcino

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 243

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013