Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giambattista Donati

Deceased

Bishop of Cervia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1715³BornFrosinone
22 Mar 173823.1Ordained PriestPriest
Feb 1764³48.9AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Switzerland
Nov 1764³49.7ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Switzerland
2 Jun 176651.3AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
8 Jun 176651.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cervia, Italy
1792¹76.8DiedBishop of Cervia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Donati
Bishop Giambattista Donati (born , died 1792) Bishop of Cervia

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1790
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 160
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 17
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Nov 2016