Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Galli

Deceased

Bishop of Tivoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1699BornRoma
19 Mar 176363.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Mar 176363.3Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jul 176464.6AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
15 Jul 176464.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tivoli, Italy
27 Apr 176565.4DiedBishop of Tivoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Galli:
Bishop Tommaso Galli (born , died ) Bishop of Tivoli

  • a priest for 2.0 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 407
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015