Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Lucerna Rorengo di RorÓ

Deceased

Archbishop of Torino {Turin}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1732BornCampiglione
5 Dec 175624.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 May 176431.5SelectedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
9 Jul 176431.6ConfirmedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
15 Jul 176431.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ivrea, Italy
20 Jan 176835.1SelectedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
14 Mar 176835.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
14 Mar 177845.3DiedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Lucerna Rorengo di RorÓ:
Archbishop Francesco Lucerna Rorengo di RorÓ (born , died ) Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 21.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 245, and Page 395
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1764, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015