Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Taglialatela

Deceased

Bishop of Sora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1716BornVillaricca
21 Sep 174024.1Ordained PriestPriest
4 Feb 176548.5AppointedBishop of Sora, Italy
10 Feb 176548.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sora, Italy
29 Dec 176751.4DiedBishop of Sora, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Taglialatela:
Bishop Tommaso Taglialatela (born , died ) Bishop of Sora

  • a priest for 27.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013