Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Tortora

Deceased

Bishop of Marsico Nuovo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1722BornNocera de Pagani
27 Jun 174523.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 Dec 176644.8AppointedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
7 Dec 176644.8Ordained BishopBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
10 May 177149.2DiedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Tortora:
Bishop Andrea Tortora (born , died ) Bishop of Marsico Nuovo

  • a priest for 25.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1770
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 278
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 8 Dec 2015