Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Zarone

Deceased

Bishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1710Born
24 Sep 173525.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 176656.5AppointedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
27 Jul 176656.5Ordained BishopBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
Aug 1791³81.5DiedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Zarone
Bishop Thomas Zarone (born , died Aug 1791) Bishop of Carinola (Calina)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasal Versano

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 140
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018