Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Spedalieri

Deceased

Bishop of Bova, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1704Born
22 Feb 172824.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 176460.5AppointedBishop of Bova, Italy
26 Aug 176460.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bova, Italy
3 Apr 179187.1DiedBishop of Bova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Spedalieri
Bishop Antonio Spedalieri (born , died ) Bishop of Bova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonasterace

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 129
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018